Meredith v. Gurun et al
Plaintiff: Kevin O'Neal Meredith
Defendant: Gurun and Chaney
Case Number: 4:2022cv01075
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for status. This case has been transferred to the Western District of Arkansas, #2 . The Court directs the Clerk to mail Meredith a copy of the docket sheet and Doc. #2 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/7/2022. (jak)
December 5, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Status Update by Kevin O'Neal Meredith. (ldb)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin O'Neal Meredith. (jak)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Mail Returned. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (incorrect file mark date) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #4 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Kevin O'Neal Meredith re #2 Order, Docket Note, #3 E-Mail. (fjg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
November 16, 2022 Filing 3 E-MAIL received from U.S. District Court Western District of Arkansas, confirming the case was received and opened in their district as case number 6:22-cv-06116. (jak)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer the entire case file to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. The transfer is immediate because the receiving Court is in the Eighth Circuit too. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/16/2022. (jak)
November 16, 2022 Docket Note: Pursuant to #2 Order, this case was transferred to the U.S. District Court Western District of Arkansas on this date. (jak)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevin O'Neal Meredith. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meredith v. Gurun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin O'Neal Meredith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?