Brooks v. Potts et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Lynn Brooks
Defendant: Susan Potts and Mark Gober
Case Number: 4:2022cv01206
Filed: December 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ldb)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 JUDGMENT: Brooks's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/17/2023. (ldb)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER withdrawing the reference and dismissing the complaint without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/17/2023. (jbh)
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jerry Lynn Brooks re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Complaint, #3 Order. (fjg)
December 23, 2022 Filing 4 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jerry Lynn Brooks re #3 Order, 1983 Complaint form. (fjg)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Drew County Detention Center and a blank 42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint form to Plaintiff; and directing Plaintiff to submit an Amended Complaint for the Court's review, consistent with the instructions in this Order within 30 days from the date of this Order, if he wishes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/06/2022. (llg)
December 1, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jerry Lynn Brooks.(kdr)
December 1, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerry Lynn Brooks. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Potts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lynn Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?