Barton v. Jacksonville Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Frederick J Barton
Defendant: Jacksonville Police Department, Does Detective/Prosecutors, Jacksonville Police Department and Pulaski County Circuit Court
Case Number: 4:2023cv00017
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Joe J Volpe
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Order. This case was dismissed on January 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 02/07/23. (dmm)
January 30, 2023 Filing 8 DECLARATION and MOTION for Copies by Frederick J Barton. (ldb)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT: Based on #5 Order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/17/2023. (llg)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 and #3 requests to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's inmate trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Pulaski County Detention Center; dismissing, without prejudice, the complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; recommending this dismissal constitute a strike; and certifying an in forma pauperis appeal of this dismissal would be frivolous and would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/17/2023. (llg)
January 10, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Frederick J Barton.(kdr)
January 10, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frederick J Barton. (kdr)
January 6, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Frederick J Barton. (llg)
January 6, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frederick J Barton. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton v. Jacksonville Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick J Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacksonville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Detective/Prosecutors, Jacksonville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?