Morningstar v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Khanis Morningstar and Jeramye Hobbs
Defendant: James H Smith, Jr, Charlotte Gardner, Aundrea Culclager and Brandy Johnson
Case Number: 4:2023cv00460
Filed: May 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Aundrea Culclager, Brandy Johnson.(Middleton, Rosalyn)
July 14, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosalyn L. Middleton on behalf of Aundrea Culclager, Brandy Johnson (Middleton, Rosalyn)
July 10, 2023 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 Answer to Complaint by Khanis Morningstar. (llg)
June 29, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Charlotte Gardner, James H Smith, Jr.(Almefty, Kynda)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Morningstar's IFP Motion; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Tucker-Max Unit and the appropriate ADC offices; directing the Clerk to prepare summonses for ADC Defendants Culclager and Johnson; and directing the USMS to serve the summonses, copies of #2 Complaint and this Order on Defendants Culclager and Johnson without prepayment of fees and costs. Service for the Wellpath Defendants, Dr. Smith and Gardner, will be directed by separate Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/6/2023. (kdr) (Docket text modified on 6/7/2023 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
June 6, 2023 Summons Issued as to Aundrea Culclager and Brandy Johnson. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
June 2, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Khanis Morningstar. (ldb)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS denying #1 IFP motion. The Clerk is directed to send plaintiff the correct IFP motion form along with a copy of this Order. If plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must, on or before 6/20/2023, either pay the $402 filing fee in full or complete and sign the IFP motion, have an authorized prison official complete and sign both the Certificate and Calculation Sheet, and return the IFP Motion and signed forms to the Clerk. Prison officials are directed to assist Morningstar in completing the necessary forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/19/2023. (jak)
May 16, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Khanis Morningstar. (ldb)
May 16, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Khanis Morningstar. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morningstar v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khanis Morningstar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeramye Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H Smith, Jr
Represented By: Kynda Almefty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Gardner
Represented By: Kynda Almefty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aundrea Culclager
Represented By: Rosalyn L. Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Johnson
Represented By: Rosalyn L. Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?