Mirgon v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Tracey Mirgon
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America and Brighton Collectibles LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00546
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2023 Filing 14 ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/1/2023. (ljb)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 and #12 motions to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/28/2023. (ljb)
July 27, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Samuel Schwartz-Fenwick. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4569528. Filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Samuel Schwartz-Fenwick)(Putman, William)
July 27, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Shelley R. Hebert. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4569516. Filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shelley R. Hebert)(Putman, William)
July 24, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Putman, William)
July 24, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Putman, William)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Tracey Mirgon has filed a #7 stipulation of dismissal of defendant Brighton Collectibles, LLC. The clerk is directed to terminate Brighton Collectibles as a party to this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/19/2023. (ljb)
July 18, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Brighton Collectibles, LLC by Tracey Mirgon. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 10, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Tracey Mirgon. Brighton Collectibles LLC served on 7/3/2023. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 10, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Tracey Mirgon. Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 6/20/2023. (Lacy, Brandon)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Prudential Insurance Company of America's answer due 7/25/2023. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/27/2023. (rmg)
June 27, 2023 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Putman, William)
June 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William Benjamin Putman, IV on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America (Putman, William)
June 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tracey Mirgon. Fee $402; Receipt No. LIT2510. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirgon v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Mirgon
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Samuel M Schwartz-Fenwick
Represented By: Shelley Renee Hebert
Represented By: William Benjamin Putman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brighton Collectibles LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?