Oliver v. Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield Long Term Disability Plan et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Oliver
Defendant: Fullscope RMS, Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield Long Term Disability Plan, USAble Life and Disability RMS
Case Number: 4:2023cv00563
Filed: June 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Stipulation, Doc. #7 , noted. Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield Long-Term Disability Plan is dismissed without prejudice as a defendant. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/24/2023. (slb)Notice: The terminated party will no longer receive filing notifications through CM/ECF. To continue receiving filing notifications, #email the Clerk of Court and request reinstatement. Please refer to the CM/ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures for Civil Filings for information about when a terminated party must be served.
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, Doc. #6 , granted. USABle Life's answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 25 August 2023. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/30/2023. (tck)
June 30, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Fullscope RMS (Decker, Byrne)
June 30, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by USAble Life (Decker, Byrne)
June 30, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Party Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield Long-Term Disability Plan Without Prejudice by Fullscope RMS, USAble Life (Decker, Byrne)
June 30, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield Long Term Disability Plan, Fullscope RMS, USAble Life (Decker, Byrne)
June 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Byrne J. Decker on behalf of USAble Life and Fullscope RMS (Decker, Byrne) Docket text modified on 6/30/2023 to correct filing parties. (kbc)
June 30, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the filing parties to "USAble Life and Fullscope RMS" as indicated on the document. (kbc)
June 28, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Fullscope RMS by Jennifer L Oliver. (Vaden, Marcus)
June 26, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer L Oliver. USAble Life served on 6/22/2023. (Vaden, Marcus)
June 22, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer L Oliver. Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield Long Term Disability Plan served on 6/22/2023. (Vaden, Marcus)
June 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS UNDER ERISA filed by Jennifer L Oliver against All Defendants. (Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT2563.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield Long Term Disability Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fullscope RMS
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Blue Cross Blue Shield Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAble Life
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disability RMS
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Oliver
Represented By: Marcus Lane Vaden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?