Howard v. North Little Rock Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Cody S Howard
Defendant: North Little Rock Police Department, C Carter and Does 1-2, Detectives, NLRPD, Prosecutor
Case Number: 4:2023cv00729
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2023 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to #6 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Cody S Howard. (jbh)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of USCA as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Cody S Howard: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (jbh)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of USCA as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Cody S Howard: The district court has determined that Appellant has three "strikes" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Accordingly, Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 9/14/2023. (jbh)
August 15, 2023 Filing 9 USCA Docketing Letter as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Cody S Howard. USCA Case Number 23-2855. (jbh)
August 15, 2023 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #5 Notice of Appeal re #2 Order, #3 Judgment. (jbh)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 motion to appeal in forma pauperis; directing Mr. Howard to either pay to this Court the $505.00 appellate filing and docketing fees or file, with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, a motion with an attached affidavit that complies with each mandate of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(1), within 30 days of this order's entry date; and directing Mr. Howard to file any future documents or pleadings related to his appeal with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/15/2023. (jbh)
August 14, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Cody S Howard. (jbh)
August 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order, #3 Judgment by Cody S Howard. (jbh)
August 10, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the signature date to 8/8/2023 as indicated by the document. (kdr) (Docket text modified on 8/10/2023 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
August 8, 2023 Filing 4 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (llg)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #2 Order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 08/08/2023. (llg)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER dismissing Mr. Howard's complaint without prejudice pursuant to the three-strikes provision of the Prison Litigation Reform Act ("PLRA"); directing Mr. Howard to submit the statutory filing and administrative fees of $402 to the Clerk of the Court, noting the above case style number, within 30 days of the entry date of this order, along with a motion to reopen the case, if he wishes to continue the case; and certifying an in forma pauperis appeal from this order or any judgment entered hereunder would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 08/08/2023. (llg) (Docket text modified on 8/10/2023 to correct signature date.) (kdr)
August 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Cody S Howard.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. North Little Rock Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody S Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Little Rock Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-2, Detectives, NLRPD, Prosecutor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?