Morton v. Staley et al
Plaintiff: Jason Morton
Defendant: John Staley, W Shipp, Holland, William Shipp and Aaron Holland
Case Number: 4:2023cv00848
Filed: September 11, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Benecia B Moore
2 Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: If Defendants intent to raise a defense that Plaintiff failed to exhaust his available administrative remedies, they must raise that issue in a motion for summary judgment filed on or before 12/11/2023. Discovery that is related to the issue of exhaustion is stayed until further order from the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the docket sheet to reflect the full names of Defendants William Shipp and Aaron Holland, as provided in their Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 11/9/2023. (kdr)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (kdr)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Holland served on 10/20/2023. (ajj)
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. W Shipp served on 10/17/2023. (ajj)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. John Staley served on 10/16/2023. (ajj)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason E. Owens on behalf of Holland, W Shipp, John Staley (Owens, Jason)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Holland, W Shipp, John Staley.(Owens, Jason)
November 2, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. The Clerk's office has reassigned the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/2/2023.(jak)
September 29, 2023 Filing 5 Filing Fee Received: $350, Receipt Number LIT3722. (ajj)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summonses for Defendants Staley, Shipp, and Holland; and directing the USMS to serve the summonses, Complaint, and this Order on Defendants at the Lonoke County Detention Center, without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/15/2023. (kdr)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 IFP Motion; directing Plaintiff's custodian to collect monthly payments from Plaintiff's institutional account until a total of $350 has been paid to the Clerk; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Jail Administrator of the Lonoke County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/15/2023. (kdr)
September 15, 2023 Summons Issued as to Holland, W Shipp and John Staley. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
September 11, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jason Morton.(kdr)
September 11, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Morton. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morton v. Staley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Staley
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Shipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Shipp
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Holland
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?