Mayfield v. Parsons et al
Plaintiff: William Mayfield
Defendant: Parsons, Gilliam, Doe and Griffin
Case Number: 4:2023cv01050
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Mayfield. (csf)
December 26, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Mayfield. (llg)
December 20, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Order by William Mayfield. (ldb)
December 19, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Order by William Mayfield. (llg)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #16 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as incomplete. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/14/2023. (smp)
December 14, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Mayfield. (csf)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #13 and #14 Mr. Mayfield's motions; and reminding him he has until 12/14/2023, to file a complete IFP application #8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/11/2023. (llg)
December 8, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Order by William Mayfield. (ldb)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Order by William Mayfield. (ldb)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Mr. Mayfield's motion; and reminding Mr. Mayfield he has until 12/14/2023 to file a complete IFP application #8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/06/2023. (llg)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint and #5 Amended Complaint; and MOTION for Order by William Mayfield (Attachment: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint) (llg)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying, without prejudice, #9 Mr. Mayfield's motion for the appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/16/2023. (llg)
November 15, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William Mayfield. (llg)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 motion for order; instructing the Clerk to provide a copy of this Order and a blank IFP application to the Warden of the Saline County Detention Facility; directing Saline County Detention Facility officials are directed to complete the portion of the form that must be completed by an authorized official and return it either to Mr. Mayfield or to the Court, within 30 days; and instructing Mayfield to notify the Court if he continues to encounter difficulties with Detention Facility officials refusing to complete his IFP application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/14/2023. (jbh)
November 13, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Mayfield. (ldb)
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Order by William Mayfield. (ldb)
November 13, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by William Mayfield. (ldb)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying #1 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing the Clerk to enclose a new IFP application along with a copy of this Order; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay a $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/2/2023. (jbh)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (ldb)
November 1, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Mayfield. (ldb)
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Mayfield. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayfield v. Parsons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?