Masiker v. Payne
Plaintiff: Aaron Scott Masiker
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, White County Detention Center and Dexter Payne
Case Number: 4:2023cv01215
Filed: December 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Respondent Dexter Payne has filed the pending motion for extension of time. In the motion, respondent seeks additional time to file a response to the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed by petitioner Aaron Scott Masiker. For good cause shown, the motion is granted. Respondent is given up to, and including, March 15, 2024, to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 02/21/2024. (jfc)
February 20, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dexter Payne (Jones, Jacob)
February 20, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Helderman Jones on behalf of Dexter Payne (Jones, Jacob)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk of the Court to serve by regular mail a copy of #1 Masiker's petition and this Order on the respondent Dexter Payne and the Attorney General for the State of Arkansas; and directing the Respondent to file an answer, motion, or other response to Masiker's petition within 21 days after service of the petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 01/30/2024. (llg)
January 29, 2024 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number LIT5101. (adj)
January 25, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaron Scott Masiker. (llg)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER giving Masiker up to, and including, 02/05/2024, to either pay the filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis; and directing the Clerk of the Court to to send Masiker the documents necessary to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis and to enter Payne's name as the respondent in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 01/03/2024. (llg)
December 26, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Aaron Scott Masiker. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masiker v. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Scott Masiker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Represented By: Jacob Helderman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?