Kennedy v. Payne
Plaintiff: Jeremy Kennedy
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Case Number: 4:2024cv00022
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeremy Kennedy. (jak)
February 13, 2024 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dexter Payne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A- Pen Pack Redacted, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Revocation Sentencing Order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C- Revocation Prosecutor's Short Report, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D- Petition for Judicial Review, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E- Order Denying Petition for Judicial Review, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F- Amended Petition for Judicial Review, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Motion for Reconsideration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I Notice of Appeal)(Johnson, Jason)
January 26, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. Johnson on behalf of Dexter Payne (Johnson, Jason)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail; and directing the respondent to file an answer, motion, or other response, to the petition within 21 days after service of this petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 01/19/2024. (llg)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (ldb)
January 8, 2024 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jeremy Kennedy. (ldb)
January 8, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Kennedy. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Represented By: Jason M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?