Kidd v. Does
Plaintiff: Raymond Kidd
Defendant: Does and Yell County Detention Facility
Case Number: 4:2024cv00212
Filed: March 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to the Yell County Detention Facility Jail Administrator. Service is not appropriate at this time. The Clerk shall mail a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form (but not an IFP Application) to Plaintiff with a copy of this order. If Plaintiff wishes amend the complaint, he must complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, label it a "Third Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and all or some of his claims may be dismissed if not properly amended within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/2/2024. (lej)
March 28, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (missing page) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #5 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jbh)
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Raymond Kidd. (ldb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2024: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jbh).
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymond Kidd. (ldb)
March 15, 2024 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does, filed by Raymond Kidd. (ldb)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk shall mail Plaintiff an IFP Application, a Calculation Sheet, and a 1983 complaint form. Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either: (a) pay the full $405 filing fee; or (b) file a properly completed IFP Application and Calculation Sheet. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the date of this order, complete and return the enclosed complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/11/2024. (lej)
March 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does, filed by Raymond Kidd. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kidd v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yell County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?