Wilkins v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Speedy Wilkins, JR
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2024cv00738
Filed: August 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Carisa German-Oden, granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel J. "Danny" Poolson, and granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jeremy J. Landry. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/25/2024. (kog)
September 20, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jeremy J. Landry. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4824362. Filed by Speedy Wilkins, Jr (Lauck, Chester)
September 20, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Daniel J. "Danny" Poolson, Jr.. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4824361. Filed by Speedy Wilkins, Jr (Lauck, Chester)
September 20, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Carisa German-Oden. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4824360. Filed by Speedy Wilkins, Jr (Lauck, Chester)
September 17, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Nichols on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Nichols, Katherine)
September 16, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Knox, Kristopher)
September 16, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher Bruce Knox on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Knox, Kristopher)
August 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company filed by Speedy Wilkins, JR. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $405 paid. Receipt Number LIT7629.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ajj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Kristopher Bruce Knox
Represented By: Katherine E. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Speedy Wilkins, JR
Represented By: Chester H. Lauck, III
Represented By: Jeremy James Landry
Represented By: Jeremy James Landry
Represented By: Daniel Poolson, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Poolson, Jr
Represented By: Carisa Renee Oden
Represented By: Carisa Renee Oden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?