Frazier v. Browley et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Ray Frazier
Defendant: Hudson, Judy Browley, Randall, Rodney Allen, Kashonda Thompkins, Lafeyette Woods, Jr. and Erika Green
Case Number: 4:2024cv00925
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Benecia B Moore
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff another blank IFP Motion, including the necessary Certificate and Calculation Sheet; directing plaintiff to, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, either (1) pay the $405 filing fee in full; or (2) complete and sign the IFP Motion and return it to the Clerk, if he wishes to proceed with this action; and directing prison officials to assist Plaintiff in completing the necessary forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 12/20/2024. (kdr)
December 17, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Carlos Ray Frazier. (llg)
October 31, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description to "INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS" as indicated on the document. (kbc)
October 31, 2024 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoners. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description to include "directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a blank IFP Motion" as indicated on the document. (kbc)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS denying #1 IFP Motion; directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a blank IFP Motion; directing Plaintiff to either pay the $405 filing fee in full, or complete and sign the IFP Motion and return it to the Clerk within 30 days of the date of this Order, if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action; and directing prison officials to assist Plaintiff in completing the necessary forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 10/30/2024. (ldb) Docket text modified on 10/31/2024 to correct description. (kbc)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (ldb)
October 24, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carlos Ray Frazier. (ldb)
October 24, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos Ray Frazier. (ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Browley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Browley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kashonda Thompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafeyette Woods, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Ray Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?