Dancy v. US Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Theron Andraus Dancy
Defendant: US Department of State, Nazanin Ash and Marta Constanzo Youth
Case Number: 4:2025cv00048
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A. Newton on behalf of US Department of State (Newton, Joshua)
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to consolidate immediately this case with the master docket in Theron A. Dancy v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al., Case No. 4:24-cv-00693-KGB. From this date forward, all filings in these cases shall be made in the case with the lower case number, Theron A. Dancy v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, et al., Case No. 4:24-cv-00693-KGB. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/11/2025. (jbh)
February 11, 2025 Cases associated. Create association to 4:24-cv-00693-KGB, pursuant to #9 Order. (jbh)
February 10, 2025 Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #7 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker. (jak)
February 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to immediately transfer this case to Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/10/2025. (ldb)
January 27, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Junior Attorney to Assist in Fulfilling Court Order. Filed by Theron Andraus Dancy. (jap)
January 27, 2025 Filing 5 AMENDED Complaint (filed pursuant to instruction from Chambers) filed by Theron Andraus Dancy. (jap)
January 27, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Theron Andraus Dancy. (jap)
January 27, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing by Theron Andraus Dancy. (jap)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (ldb)
January 21, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Theron Andraus Dancy against All Defendants. (Fee $405, Receipt Number LIT9222.) Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff. (Copy mailed.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ldb) (Docket entry modified on 1/23/2025 to correct document restriction.)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dancy v. US Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theron Andraus Dancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of State
Represented By: Joshua A. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nazanin Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marta Constanzo Youth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?