Hudson v. FedEx Ground Package System Inc et al
Plaintiff: Akeeme Hudson
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System Inc, KBT Transportation Inc, Hi-Tech STL Logistics Inc and Edmond Henry Seals
Case Number: 4:2025cv00144
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion to extend time for service of process; and extending the time to complete service of process to, and including, 7/14/2025. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/16/2025. (jbh)
April 9, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Seals by Akeeme Hudson (Gates, Joseph)
April 9, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to the recusal by Judge Billy Roy Wilson, the Clerk's office has randomly reassigned this case to Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/9/2025. (jak)
February 27, 2025 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hi-Tech STL Logistics Inc.(O'Brien, Garrett)
February 27, 2025 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by KBT Transportation Inc.(O'Brien, Garrett)
February 27, 2025 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by FedEx Ground Package System Inc.(O'Brien, Garrett)
February 21, 2025 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/30/2025. Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/14/2025. Jury Trial set for 2/24/2026 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 2/21/25. (mmb)
February 20, 2025 Filing 4 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(A) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (jak)
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by FedEx Ground Package System Inc. (ajj)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Akeeme Hudson. (ajj)
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FedEx Ground Package System Inc from Lonoke County Circuit Court, case number 43CV-25-58. Fee of $405 paid. Receipt Number LIT9576. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ajj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2025: #2 Notice of Removal w/original signature (submitted 2/28/2025), #3 Civil Cover Sheet - Correct (submitted 2/28/2025)) (jbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. FedEx Ground Package System Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akeeme Hudson
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System Inc
Represented By: Garrett O'Brien
Represented By: Brad M. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBT Transportation Inc
Represented By: Garrett O'Brien
Represented By: Brad M. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Tech STL Logistics Inc
Represented By: Garrett O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmond Henry Seals
Represented By: Garrett O'Brien
Represented By: Brad M. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?