Lee v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Ledell Lee
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2001cv00377
Filed: November 2, 2001
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2016 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 153 Motion. Sallings is relieved as counsel. Gipson and Brotherton's motion, 148 is denied. If Lee's lawyers find they can't pursue necessary proceedings without an Arkansas law license, then they should move to have local counsel appointed at that time. But Gipson and Brotherton would still be doing the legwork. This case is at a critical stage; and Lee needs his long-time lawyers to see it through. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2016. (jak)
December 18, 2013 128 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, the Court enters final judgment in this matter, denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for reasons set forth in the Court's 115 Order dated 6/18/13. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 12/18/13. (vjt)
June 18, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and finding that Lee has failed to establish his entitlement to a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 6/18/2013. (jak)
September 20, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 97 Motion for Stay and Abeyance of Federal Proceedings filed by Ledell Lee. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 9/20/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledell Lee
Represented By: Gary E. Brotherton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Valerie Glover Fortner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?