Fudge v. Norris, et al

Plaintiff: James Charles Fudge
Defendant: J T Banks, R Evans, E Hobbs, T Nelson-Courtney and Rickey McCarrell
Case Number: 5:2003cv00461
Filed: December 8, 2003
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2009 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 200 Request filed by James Charles Fudge for the reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses and ordering the Clerk of the Court to disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $1,008.66 and distribute to J. Slocum Pickell, a copy of this order and the application to be placed in the Library Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/28/09. (bkp)
January 21, 2009 198 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting plaintiff's counsel's motion for withdrawal 197 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/21/09. (bkp)
January 20, 2009 195 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT as to defendants re 193 Jury Verdict; dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/20/09. (bkp)
January 8, 2009 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER holding that inmate Bobby Green will not be allowed to testify and that a decision on whether inmate Antonio Ellis should be allowed to testify will be made on the day of trial 185 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/8/09. (bkp)
January 6, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 170 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part 160 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by J A Harris, E Hobbs, J T Banks, T Nelson-Courtney, R Evans, Ricky McCarrell. Plaintiff's due process claims against defts Evans and Harris are dismissed but he may proceed against defts Nelson-Courtney, McCarrell, Evans, E. Hobbs and Banks on his excessive force claims. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/6/09. (bkp)
December 10, 2008 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to respond to the 160 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by defts within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/10/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fudge v. Norris, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Charles Fudge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J T Banks
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Evans
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Hobbs
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Nelson-Courtney
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey McCarrell
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?