Smith v. Fontaine, et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv00100
Filed: March 19, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2009 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 210 Motion for Reconsideration re 208 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/14/09. (bkp)
August 31, 2009 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER awarding 204 Attorney Fees and Costs to plaintiff in the amount of $10,455.00. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/31/09. (bkp)
June 16, 2009 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 199 Second Motion for Reconsideration; directing deft Insley's to disburse the settlement proceeds of $2,250.00; dismissing all claims against deft Insley's with prejudice; directing pltf's attorney, Morris Thomps on, to file a motion for attorneys fees and costs within 20 days of the entry of this Order; and directing the Clerk to provide a copy of this Order to Ricky Smith, ADC #133989, P.O. Box 1630, Malvern, AR 72104, and to change the Court records to reflect this address. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/16/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 6/17/2009 to correct typographical error.) (thd)
May 14, 2009 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 194 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/14/09. (bkp)
May 12, 2009 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue a check to On the Record Reporting & Transcription, Inc. in the amount of $37.80 and to provide a copy of this Order to the Financial Section of the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/12/09. (bkp)
March 30, 2009 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to all parties. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/30/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Fontaine, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?