Whitham v. Norris

Plaintiff: Glenn Edward Whitham
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2004cv00307
Filed: August 24, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for New Trial, To Alter Or Amend Judgment, And For Reconsideration Or Clarification. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/17/08. (mkf)
October 29, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Larry Norris against Glenn Edward Whitham re 15 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing petition with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/29/08. (bkp)
September 9, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the 1 Petition be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 9/23/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 9/9/2008. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitham v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Edward Whitham
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Rosenzweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Represented By: Joseph V. Svoboda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?