Greene v. Norris

Case Number: 5:2004cv00373
Filed: October 20, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2015 223 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 222 Opinion and Order of Dismissal entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered, and Adjudged that this petition for writ of habeas corpus be, and it hereby is, dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 03/27/2015. (rhm)
October 4, 2011 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Central Office of the ADC to ensure the attendance of petitioner Jack Gordon Greene, at the evidentiary hearing on 10/6/11 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/4/11. (vjt)
September 27, 2011 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Respondent's 161 Motion to Disqualify Counsel is granted as follows: Mr. Braden may testify at the competency hearing and may remain at counsel table for the limited purpose of assisting Mr. Lee on the condition that he withdraw his name as counsel of record in this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/27/11. (vjt)
July 25, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 153 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/25/11. (vjt)
May 23, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion for Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion for Order; denying 148 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/23/11. (kpr)
October 15, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 121 Petitioner's Motion for Ruling and Other Relief is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; the motion is granted to the extent that Petitioner's counsel is authorized to conduct discovery in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/15/10. (vjt)
May 24, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 115 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/24/10. (dac)
March 18, 2010 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 102 Motion to Stay (which the Court construes as a motion for a stay and for certification of an interlocutory appeal). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/18/2010. (mkf)
June 12, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for Reconsideration re 32 MOTION for Order Permitting Access to Petitioner for Psychological Evaluation filed by Larry Norris; denying Respondent's motion for access to petitioner 32 , with all other rulings in the June 10, 2009, Order remaining in effect 41 . Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/12/09. (bkp)
June 10, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Order Permitting Access to Petitioner for Psychological Evaluation and directing the ADC to permit a special contact visit on June 16 and 17, 2009 between Petitioner and Dr. Roger Moore; granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Discovery; granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Expert Report until 5:00 p.m., Monday, July 13, 2009 and Respondent's expert report must be disclosed by 5:00 p.m., Monday, August 3, 2009; and continuing the evidentiary hearing scheduled for August 13 and 14, 2009, until November 23 and 24, 2009, to be held in Courtroom 4C at 9:30 a.m. in the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/10/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?