Mills v. White et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv00304
Filed: November 3, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2012 249 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Pursuant to the verdict returned by the jury on April 3, 2012; IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that on the claims of plaintiff Jon Mills, judgment is rendered for defendant R. Bailey and plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/4/12. (hph)
November 7, 2011 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 220 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 212 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by R Bailey is DENIED; deft Jeremy Adams is DISMISSED from this case without prejudice for failure to serve; Jeremy Adams terminated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/7/11. (vjt)
June 15, 2011 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 207 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; denying 209 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, and directing plaintiff to file a response to deft's motion for summary judgment within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/15/11. (kpr)
June 9, 2011 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER unless pltf obtains service over deft Andrews within 10 days of the date of this Order, the Court will dismiss him from pltf's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/9/11. (vjt)
March 9, 2011 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice deft Bailey's Second Motion for Summary Judgment 182 ; the parties are directed to complete discovery within 60 days of the date of this Order; dispositive motions must be filed 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/9/11. (vjt)
September 23, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to the 182 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by R Bailey within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/23/10. (bkp)
August 11, 2010 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to the 182 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by R Bailey within 20 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/11/10. (bkp)
June 9, 2010 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating the appointment of attorney, L. Ashley Higgins, and appointing attorney, Zachary Taylor, to represent the plaintiff in all further proceedings in this case; and holding the deft's summary judgment motion 182 in abeyance pending this appointment process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/9/10. (bkp)
September 24, 2008 161 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 160 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/24/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?