Cantrell v. Norris

Case Number: 5:2005cv00356
Filed: December 28, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Referring Judge: John F. Forster
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 129 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/31/09. (bkp)
February 20, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Larry Norris against Jimmy Shane Cantrell re 126 Order on Report and Recommendations; case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/20/09. (mkf)
December 19, 2008 109 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 83 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jimmy Shane Cantrell be DENIED and case be Dismissed With Prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/19/08. (dac)
October 1, 2008 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 100 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 99 Motion to Stay filed by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. Clerk is directed to provide petitioner a copy of docket entries 93, 94 and 85 and petitioner shall reply to the arguments raised in the response within 20 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/1/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?