Proctor v. Smallwood et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv00075
Filed: March 31, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: George Howard
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 133 Motion for Disbursement of Funds and ordering the Clerk to distribute to the appointed counsel the total amount of $1,583.83 from the Fund and to maintain a copy of this Order in the Fund file maintained by the Clerk of the Court and paid in full. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/15/09. (bkp)
March 23, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Bonnie Smallwood, Ray Hobbs against Terry Proctor dismissing case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/23/09. (bkp)
March 16, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Defts' 118 motion for summary judgment be GRANTED and Pltf's complaint 2 be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; all pending motions be DENIED AS MOOT; Objections to R&R due by 3/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/16/09. (vjt) (Docket text modified on 3/18/2009 to correct the deadline for Objection to the R&R, as set forth in the document.) (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor v. Smallwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?