Newingham et al v. Magness et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv00275
Filed: October 20, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2010 281 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 280 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/13/10. (vjt)
November 3, 2010 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 276 Khabir's Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections; Objections to R&R due 12/6/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/3/10. (vjt)
October 19, 2010 274 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf Khabir's request for injunctive relief in the form of access to a prayer rug be denied, and this case be dismissed with prejudice 2 . Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/19/2010. (lej)
July 14, 2010 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf Khabir's 262 Motion for Reconsideration re 258 Order denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/14/10. (vjt)
February 8, 2008 203 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that defts' motion for summary judgment be granted, and pltfs' complt be dismissed with prejudice 152 . Pltfs' motion for summary judgment be denied 192 . All other pending motions be denied as moot 193 196 198 201 . Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/8/2008. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newingham et al v. Magness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?