Edwards v. Davis et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv00285
Filed: November 3, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2010 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 120 Motion to Enforce as moot and denying defts' request for costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/13/10. (bkp)
October 4, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 120 MOTION to Enforce filed by Jay B Edwards directing defts to file any response they may have no later than 5 p.m., Friday, October 8, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/4/10. (bkp)
June 15, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 114 Motion to Enforce. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/15/10. (bkp)
January 21, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/21/10. (bkp)
June 1, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 105 Motion to Set Aside; and finding as moot 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/1/09. (bkp)
April 27, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER denying 87 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Davis and denying 89 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to 91 Partial Report and Recommendation and 96 Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/27/09. (mkf)
April 24, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations 91 and denying 87 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Jay B Edwards against deft Davis. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/24/09. (bkp)
February 5, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 Motion for Default Judgment; Adopting 84 Partial Report and Recommendation in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/5/09. (mkf)
September 11, 2008 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 68 Motions for Default Judgment; Adopting 71 Partial Report and Recommendations; a default judgment will be entered against Defendant Cook after all claims against the remaining co-defendant are resolved. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/11/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?