Wenzel v. Norris

Plaintiff: Joseph Wenzel
Defendant: Donny Robinson, Larry Norris, Correctional Medical Services, Hermann Jonak, Jimmy Powell and David Cruiseturner
Case Number: 5:2007cv00042
Filed: February 28, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 91 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/7/11. (vjt)
December 8, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 80 Motion to Dismiss deft Herman Jonak without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/8/10. (bkp)
November 4, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER relieving Thomas M. Hughes, III as counsel for plaintiff and appointing Charles D. Harrison to represent plaintiff; directing the Clerk to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order; and directing Counsel to access and review Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/4/09. (bkp)
October 20, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion for Reconsideration re 54 Memorandum and Order 55 Judgment and directing that this case be re-opened; appointing Thomas M. Hughes, III, 301 West Arch Street, Searcy, AR 72143, to represent plaintiff; and directing the Clerk to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/20/09. (bkp)
September 29, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 54 Memorandum and Order dismissing complaint without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/29/09. (bkp)
July 23, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing William T. Marshall to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings in this action and directing the Clerk to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/23/09. (bkp)
April 30, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to submit an affidavit on or before June 1, 2009 stating the names of the attorneys he has contacted re representation in this matter. Signed by Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr. on 4/30/09. (bkp) (Docket entry modified on 5/1/2009 to correct the signer.)(bkp).
January 30, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 37 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 29 Motion to Dismiss filed by Correctional Medical Services. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/30/09. (bkp)
December 10, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to 29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Correctional Medical Services within ten days of the date of this Order or risk dismissal without prejudice of plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/10/08. (bkp)
October 28, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's request in his 11 Amended Complaint to dismiss deft Larry Norris from this lawsuit. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/28/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wenzel v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hermann Jonak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cruiseturner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?