Bohannon v. Johnson Food Equipment Inc et al

Plaintiff: Gwendolyn L Bohannon
Defendant: Johnson Food Equipment Inc, Baader-Johnson, Baader North America Corporation and Baader Food Processing Machinery
Case Number: 5:2007cv00123
Filed: May 25, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2010 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement by the parties. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/26/10. (bkp)
February 25, 2010 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 247 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/25/10. (bkp)
February 24, 2010 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 251 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/24/10. (bkp)
February 23, 2010 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 240 Motion for Reconsideration of order granting plaintiff's second motion in limine and for adverse inference instruction. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/23/10. (bkp)
January 14, 2010 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 229 Motion to Strike Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Defendant 220 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/14/10. (bkp)
September 3, 2009 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 211 Motion to Substitute Attorney; granting 213 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/3/09. (bkp)
June 15, 2009 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting aside the verdict, a new trial date to be scheduled by subequent order; and finding as moot 179 Motion for Bill of Costs; denying 188 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/15/09. (bkp)
April 23, 2009 172 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting defts' Motion for a Judgment as a Matter of Law to dismiss Baader North America Corporation as a deft and directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate Baader North American Corporation d/b/a Baader Food Processing Machinery as a deft. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/23/09. (bkp)
January 30, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 115 Motion in Limine; denying 117 Motion in Limine; denying 119 Motion in Limine; granting 121 Motion in Limine; denying 123 Motion in Limine; granting 125 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 127 Motion in Limine; denying 129 Motion in Limine; granting 131 Motion in Limine; granting 133 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion in Limine; denying 139 Motion in Limine; and amending the Court's Order of January 23, 2009 to state that plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4 is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/30/09. (bkp)
January 23, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 135 Motion in Limine No. 4. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/23/09. (bkp)(AMENDED by Order dated 1/30/09.) Modified on 1/30/2009 (bkp).
January 20, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 141 Notice of Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Gwendolyn L Bohannon for Thomas J. Prebil. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/20/09. (bkp)
January 7, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 90 Motion in Limine and for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/7/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohannon v. Johnson Food Equipment Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn L Bohannon
Represented By: Nelson Gregory Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Food Equipment Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baader-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baader North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baader Food Processing Machinery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?