McKinley v. Hooks et al
Plaintiff: Jason Glen McKinley
Defendant: David Hooks, Brent Cole and Everette Wilkerson
Case Number: 5:2007cv00239
Filed: September 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Judgment pursuant to 120 Memorandum and Order dismissing case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/4/10. (bkp)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER setting an evidentiary hearing at 9:30 a.m., on February 22, 2010, at the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse and directing the Ark Dept of Correction to ensure the attendance of the plaintiff, Jason Glen McKinley, together with his medical and institutional files, at the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/16/10. (bkp)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 59 Defendant Huey's Motion for Summary Judgment; Pltf's case against Defendant Huey is DISMISSED with prejudice; Pltf's case will proceed at this time against Defendants Cole, Wilkerson, and Wickers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 1/27/09. (mkf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinley v. Hooks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Glen McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everette Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?