Fudge v. Brantley et al

Plaintiff: James C Fudge
Defendant: Judith Brantley, Carlee Griswold, Grant Harris and Ricky McCarrell
Case Number: 5:2007cv00280
Filed: October 29, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 81 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing case without prejudice; and certifying that an ifp appeal taken from the order and this judgment is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/27/09. (bkp)
October 9, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with LR 5.5(c)(2), and for failure to respond to the Court's order 2 . The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/9/2009. (lej)
February 2, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 69 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects' Pltf's claims against Defendant Judith Brantley are DISMISSED without prejudice, and Brantley's name is removed as a party Defendant. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/2/09. (mkf)
January 13, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); Pltf's claims against Griswold and Harris were dismissed with prejudice on April 25, 2008; judgment will be entered at the conclusion of this case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fudge v. Brantley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Fudge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlee Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky McCarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?