Haynes v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Walter Haynes
Defendant: Larry Norris, David White, Larry May and Patrick L Stephenson
Case Number: 5:2007cv00295
Filed: November 13, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2008 107 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in the sum of $2,501.00 in favor of plaintiff and against deft Stephenson pursuant to the 106 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/30/08. (bkp)
September 24, 2008 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Motion to Extend Time to file objections to proposed findings to 5:00 p.m. no more than fourteen days after the certified transcript is filed; and denying 91 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and directing the Clerk to send plaintiff another copy of the R.D.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/24/08. (bkp)
September 19, 2008 88 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that the Court adopt this Recommended Disposition and that Judgment be entered in favor of the Plaintiff and against Defendant Stephenson in the sum of $2,501.00. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/19/08. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick L Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?