Williams v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Thelma Williams, Jr
Defendant: R Johnson, Page, Jackson and D F Johnson
Case Number: 5:2008cv00006
Filed: January 8, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2009 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 234 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Defts' 225 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; Pltf's pending claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/1/09. (vjt)
November 16, 2009 234 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that 225 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be granted with prejudice; and recommending that the District Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action would be frivolous and not taken in good faith Objections to R&R due 11 days from the date the recommended disposition is received. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/16/09. (hph)
August 19, 2009 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling evidentiary hearing, to be reset following a ruling on the summary judgment motion, if appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/19/09. (bkp)
September 26, 2008 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Court declines to accept 131 Partial Report and Recommendations and Remands 102 Greg Harmon's motion for summary judgment to Magistrate Judge Deere for further consideration. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/26/08. (dac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D F Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?