Hooper v. Norris

Plaintiff: Danny Lee Hooper
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2008cv00033
Filed: February 7, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; re 50 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/1/10. (dac)
January 6, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the motion for 48 Certificate of Appealability filed by Danny Lee Hooper be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/6/10. (tjj)
June 25, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT denying 37 38 39 41 Motions re 46 Order on Report and Recommendations; petition is dismissed with prejudice; the relief prayed for is denied. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/25/09. (mkf)
May 26, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Danny Lee Hooper be dismissed with prejudice and relief prayed for denied; and all pending motions be denied. Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/26/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooper v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lee Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?