Stokes et al v. 3J Trucking Inc et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Deshazer and Darryl Stokes
Defendant: 3J Trucking Inc and Roy Lee Jordan
Case Number: 5:2008cv00163
Filed: June 3, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2010 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 249 MOTION for Non-Suit Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/29/10. (vjt)
June 25, 2010 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiffs to file a status report on this case on or before July 23, 2010. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/25/10. (bkp)
March 19, 2010 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/19/10. (bkp)
March 17, 2010 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 245 Joint Motion for Disbursement of Funds from Lincoln General. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/17/10. (bkp)
February 5, 2010 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 242 James & Veronica Wells' Motion to Clarify Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/5/2010. (jct)
October 14, 2009 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 173 174 Motions to Compel and dismissing plaintiff's motion to compel discovery responses from James A. Wells and Veronica Wells with prejudice to Stokes re-filing this motion concerning his remaining discovery requests. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/14/09. (bkp)
September 10, 2009 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 80 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot 102 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/10/09. (bkp)
July 16, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs 11 days from the date of this Order to show cause why Lincoln General should not be dismissed as a party to this case 151 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/16/09. (bkp)
April 13, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/13/09. (bkp)
March 26, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs Darryl Stokes and Patrick Deshazer up to and including May 15, 2009, to file their responses to H&P Leasing's March 13, 2009 Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Incorporated Brief; and granting 114 Motion to Quash.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/26/09. (bkp)
March 9, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 80 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Replies due by 5/15/2009); granting 95 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/9/09. (bkp)
March 2, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER stating that the Court's Order of February 27, 2009, is amended to state that deft's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death is granted to the extent that the claims made by pltf Darryl Stokes in the Third Amended Complaint against 3J Trucking are dismissed as they are violations of 11 U.S.C. Sect. 362. 77 84 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/2/09. (bkp) (AMENDED ORDER WITHDRAWN per 120 Order) (vjt).
February 2, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion to Intervene and directing the Clerk to accept for filing the complaint for interpleader attached as Exhibit B to the motion. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/2/09. (bkp)
January 26, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting 62 Motion for Joinder and allowing plaintiffs Stokes and Deshazer up to and including February 9, 2009, to amend their pleadings and complete service of process on H&P Leasing; and granting 63 Motion to depose deft Roy Lee Jordan on February 18, 2009 at 1:00 p.m. at the Jefferson County Jail in Pine Bluff, AR. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/26/09. (bkp) Modified on 1/26/2009 to correct typographical error(dac).
January 14, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and granting consolidated plaintiffs up to and including 1/27/09 to amend and complete service of process on H&P Leasing; granting 58 Motion for Leave to Depose Roy Lee Jordan on 2/18/09 at 1:00 p.m. at the Jefferson County Jail in Pine Bluff, Arkansas. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/14/09. (bkp)
December 23, 2008 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 H & P Leasing Inc.'s Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment. The default, 46 Order, entered in this case on 11/13/08 is set aside based upon Plaintiffs' failure to properly effect service of process on said Defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/23/08. (jct)
November 13, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Default Judgment against H&P Leasing, a hearing to be held to determine the amount of damages. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/13/08. (bkp) Modified on 12/23/2008 to reflect default set aside pursuant to 53 Order (jct).
October 20, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE pursuant to bankruptcy proceedings, and directing deft 3J Trucking to give the Court a status report on the bankruptcy case 90 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/20/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes et al v. 3J Trucking Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Deshazer
Represented By: James H. Hada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Stokes
Represented By: James H. Hada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3J Trucking Inc
Represented By: Kathryn A. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Lee Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?