Pitman et al v. Engstrom et al

Plaintiff: Curtis Pitman and Kiara Smith
Defendant: Edward Engstrom, Frazier, Baker, Thomas and A Burton
Case Number: 5:2008cv00198
Filed: July 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against Curtis Pitman pursuant to 81 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/2/09. (bkp)
November 12, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by Curtis Pitman. Objections to REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS due 11/27/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/12/2009. (jas)
June 3, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 59 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this court's findings in all respects; plaintiff's claims of deliberate indifference to his "sexual addiction" disorder are DISMISSED, and defendant Doctor Engstrom is DISMISSED as a party defendant. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/3/2009. (mkf)
December 9, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 34 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying pltf's motion for reconsideration 32 , denying pltf's motion to appoint counsel 31 and denying motion for an emergency appointment of a mental health expert 33 , and certifying that an ifp appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/9/08. (bkp)
November 3, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations 20 and dismissing pltf Kiara Smith's claims with prejudice, this dismissal to count as a "strike,; and the Court certifies that an ifp appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/3/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitman et al v. Engstrom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Pitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiara Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Engstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?