Pioneer Civil Construction LLC et al v. Volvo Construction Equipment North America Inc
Plaintiff: Pioneer Civil Construction LLC and Trinity Universal Insurance Company
Defendant: Volvo Construction Equipment North America Inc
Case Number: 5:2008cv00207
Filed: July 28, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Ashley
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Petition for Removal-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT in favor of Pioneer Civil Construction LLC against Volvo Construction Equipment North America Inc in the amount of $108,061.00 with post-judgment interest at a rate of 0.46% re 35 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/20/09. (bkp)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER determining that Verdict Form 3 was incorrectly completed and based on Verdict Form 1, no percentage of responsibility should be applied to Pioneer Construction/Trinity Insurance. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/15/09. (bkp)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 27 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/9/09. (bkp)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 10 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/16/09. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pioneer Civil Construction LLC et al v. Volvo Construction Equipment North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneer Civil Construction LLC
Represented By: Kelly Wayne McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly Wayne McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Construction Equipment North America Inc
Represented By: Michael J. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?