Deaton v. Norris
Plaintiff: Keith Allen Deaton
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2008cv00221
Filed: August 6, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER directing the Clerk's office to refrain from docketing any future pro se pleadings from petitioner Keith Allen Deaton without prior approval. Deaton is represented by Dana Reece, and all future pleadings must bear her signature. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/5/11. (kpr)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to substitute Ray Hobbs for Larry Norris. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/2/10. (bkp)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT re 22 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the petition with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/7/10. (bkp)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER advising Petitioner of his opportunity to reply to 5 Respondent's Response to Habeas Petition within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/26/09. (mkf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deaton v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Allen Deaton
Represented By: Dana A. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?