Jones v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Defendant: Ray Hobbs and Grant Harris
Case Number: 5:2008cv00233
Filed: August 21, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2012 171 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 170 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/28/12. (vjt)
February 15, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's pro se 133 Motion to Certify Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/15/11. (vjt)
September 21, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 114 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 51 and 70 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment filed by Grant Harris and Ray Hobbs are GRANTED; Grant Harris and Ray Hobbs are hereby DISMISSED from pltf's complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/21/10. (vjt)
July 8, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 42 Answer to Amended Complaint directing the defts to file a dispositive motion within 30 days of this Order if they intend to rely on the defenses mentioned in their Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/8/09. (bkp)
January 20, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/20/09. (bkp)
September 2, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; case is DISMISSED without prejudice; relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/2/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?