Spencer v. White et al

Plaintiff: Dameon Spencer
Defendant: Floyd White, Ron Nichols and Mark Cashion
Case Number: 5:2008cv00235
Filed: August 26, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defts Floyd White, Ron Nichols against pltf Dameon Spencer re 65 Order dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/17/10. (bkp)
December 28, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting deft Cashion's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/28/09. (bkp)
September 30, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion to Certify Class and denying 20 Supplemental Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/30/09. (bkp) (The docket text was modified on 10/1/2009 to correct the description of the document filed.)(thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dameon Spencer
Represented By: B. Dale West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?