Townsend v. Golden et al

Plaintiff: Antonio Paviese Townsend
Defendant: Ernest Golden, J W Green, Vickie Maxwell and S Sandine
Case Number: 5:2008cv00260
Filed: September 22, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Arkansas
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Ernest Golden against Antonio Paviese Townsend re 28 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/9/09. (bkp)
February 20, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that deft Golden's motion for summary judgment be granted and pltf's complt be dismissed with prejudice 20 . The Court certifies that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 3/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/20/2009. (lej)
October 20, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's complaint against defts Green, Maxwell and Sandine without prejudice. Service is appropriate for the remaining deft, Ernest Golden, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the original complaint with any attachments, a copy of the docket sheet and summons without prepayment of fees. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/20/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Golden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Paviese Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J W Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Sandine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?