Pryor v. Norris

Plaintiff: Theresa C W Pryor
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2008cv00315
Filed: November 28, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 26 Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Report and Recommendations; petition for writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/07/2009. (mkf)
April 20, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the petition be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust 2 20 ; further recommending petitioner's motion to transfer be denied 14 ; Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/20/09. (tjj)
January 14, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Respondent to file a brief, with citation of authority, within 30 days addressing the issues set forth in this Order 2 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/14/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pryor v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa C W Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Represented By: Pamela Rumpz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?