Bumgardner v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Jimmy Doyle Bumgardner
Defendant: Larry Norris, Wendy Kelley, Correctional Medical Services, Mid America Dental, Richard A Carpenter and Canady
Case Number: 5:2008cv00321
Filed: December 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 165 Magistrate Judge Kearney's recommended disposition with clarifications; granting 146 Defendants Kelley and Norris's motion for partial summary judgment; granting 149 Defendants Canady, Carpenter, and CMS's moti on for summary judgment; granting 164 Bumgardner's motion for more time to respond. Bumgardner's complaint against Norris, Kelley, Carpenter, and CMS is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Bumgardner'S complaint against Canady is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/23/11. (hph)
January 25, 2011 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 146 149 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment filed by defts. The Court directs defts to provide a copy of Dr. Jackson's report, and any other relevant evidence, to the Court within seven days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/25/11. (bkp)
January 7, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment 146 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment: Plaintiff is directed to file responses to defts' motions within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/7/11. (bkp)
October 1, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 128 Motion for Reconsideration re the denial of his request for an outside dental examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/1/10. (vjt)
May 12, 2010 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Joseph Patrick Jaynes to represent the plaintiff in all further proceedings; and directing the Clerk to send to counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/12/10. (bkp)
April 6, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 105 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 85 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mid America Health Inc is GRANTED, and this deft is dismissed from pltf's complaint. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/6/10. (vjt)
November 6, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to the 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mid America Health Inc within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/6/09. (bkp)
July 8, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing G. Gregory Niblock to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings in this action; and directing the Clerk to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/8/09. (bkp)
May 29, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 51 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice; granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Richard A Carpenter. Answer due 6/5/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/29/09. (bkp)
April 30, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Take Deposition from Jimmy Doyle Bumgardner ; denying 40 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/30/09. (bkp)
April 21, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that defts' response to the Court's March 30, 2009 Order be filed under seal, along with the addresses for defts Mid America Health, Inc. and Dr. Carpenter; that the Clerk prepare summons for defts Dr. Richard Carpenter and Mid America Health, Inc. (Formerly known as Mid-America Dental) and the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the summons and complaint on defts at the addresses provided under seal, without prepayment of fees therefor, and that the U.S. Marshall shall send plaintiff's copy of process to the Clerk of the Court, who will remove the addresses prior to forwarding a copy to plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/21/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bumgardner v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Doyle Bumgardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid America Dental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?