Wright-Langhammer v. Suhl et al

Plaintiff: Barbara D Wright-Langhammer
Defendant: Ted Suhl, Joel Landreneau and Lord's Ranch Behavioral Health Care System, Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2008cv00335
Filed: December 18, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Drew
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the Court having been notified that a settlement has been reached in this matter, hereby dismisses the complaint and all claims in this action against defts with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/20/10. (vjt)
July 17, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defts' 5 MOTION to Dismiss; pltf's claims against Suhl and Landreneau individually are hereby dismissed; the motion to dismiss regarding the claims against Arkansas Counseling Associates, Arkansas Counseling Associates 2007, and The Lord's Ranch, is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/17/09. (vjt)
April 24, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving notice to the Plaintiff that the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice unless proof of service is filed on or before May 8, 2009, or the Plaintiff establishes good cause for the failure to serve summons and complaint within 120 days after the filing of the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/24/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright-Langhammer v. Suhl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara D Wright-Langhammer
Represented By: Sara M. Hartness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Suhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Landreneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lord's Ranch Behavioral Health Care System, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?