Hampton v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Alonzo Hampton
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction and Correctional Medical Services
Case Number: 5:2008cv00342
Filed: December 22, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 31 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing case without prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/1/09. (bkp)
May 8, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the ADC Defts' 21 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous and the medical Defts' 24 MOTION to Dismiss be GRANTED; Objections to R&R due by 5/22/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/8/09. (vjt)
March 10, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing deft Arkansas Department of Correction as a party. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/10/09. (bkp)
February 18, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the defts and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on defts in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/18/09. (bkp) (The correct document was substituted as the attachment on 2/18/2009, pursuant to instructions from Chambers.) (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?