Long v. Broughton et al

Plaintiff: Clyde R Long
Defendant: Broughton and Correctional Medical Services
Case Number: 5:2009cv00015
Filed: January 15, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2010 282 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 281 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/9/10. (vjt)
November 2, 2010 276 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that 259 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be granted; recommending Plaintiff's claims against Defendant York should be dismissed without prejudice; and recommending Plaintiff's claims again st Defendant Broughton should be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/2/10. (hph) (Docket text modified on 11/3/2010 to correct typographical error.) (hph).
October 6, 2010 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 267 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against deft Toney (deceased) are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's Order 238 ; R L Toney terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/6/10. (vjt)
July 7, 2010 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 250 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, Motions to Dismiss 224 243 filed by defts Roberts and Couthure are GRANTED; all claims against defts Jammie Couthure and Joyce Roberts are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/7/10. (vjt)
April 1, 2010 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 221 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Deft Lytle's 217 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and all claims against him are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/1/10. (vjt)
March 31, 2010 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 219 Partial Report and Recommendations; 213 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defts Roberts and Couture is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Pltf's claims against Roberts regarding her failure to provide pain medication in August 2007 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Pltf's remaining claim against Roberts and his claim against Couture continue, and the Defts' 224 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss or Partial Objections is construed solely as a motion to dismiss those remaining claims; Pltf has 14 days from the entry of this Order to file a response to said motion. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/31/10. (vjt)
September 14, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/14/09. (bkp)
April 2, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 25 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Clyde R Long. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/2/09. (bkp)
March 11, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration of 17 Order adopting the partial recommended disposition of Judge Beth Deere. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/11/09. (bkp)
January 20, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to send plaintiff a copy of this order and a copy of the form application to proceed ifp including the certificate and account statement forms and directing plaintiff to return the application or the $350 statutory filing fee within 30 days from receipt of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/20/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Broughton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde R Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?