Young et al v. Hurst et al

Plaintiff: Guy B Young, Mark Glover, Clifford Chambers, Ronnie Rucker, Dale Riley and Kevin Payton
Defendant: Mike Hurst, Ed Adams, Robert Jackson, King, Hawkins, S Vance, Ford-Scott and Rushing
Case Number: 5:2009cv00027
Filed: January 28, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 118 Report and Recommendations; denying 122 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Guy B Young; finding the 120 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Guy B Young moot; and administratively closing this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/8/10. (bkp)
June 10, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice pltf's 107 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and 108 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/10/10. (vjt)
June 7, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 105 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting 94 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ford-Scott, S Vance, Rushing, Hawkins, Ed Adams and dismissing these defts from plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/7/10. (bkp) (Docket entry modified on 6/7/2010 to correct the linkage.) (thd).
March 16, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for deft Robert Jackson, Jr. and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and complaints (de#s 2, 23, 33) on deft without prepayment of fees therefor; and directing defts to provide any additional information concerning deft King's location within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/16/10. (bkp)
March 10, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing parties to file with the Court the last known addresses of defts King and Jackson within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/10/10. (bkp)
May 26, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's May 6, 2009 Order adopting the Partial Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/26/09. (bkp)
May 6, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 31 Partial Report and Recommendations; defendant Mike Hurst is DISMISSED from plaintiff's complaint, for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/6/09. (mkf)
April 21, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, original and amended complaints on defts without prepayment of fees; further directing that plaintiffs Glover, Chambers, Rucker, Riley and Payton should be removed as co-plaintiffs in this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/21/09. (bkp)
February 5, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the Court (or submit an amended complaint as clarification) within fifteen days of the date of this Order concerning whether Mark Glover, Clifford Chambers, Ronnie Rucker, Dale Riley, and Kevin Payton are intended as co-plaintiffs to his complaint; failure to respond to this Order shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of plaintiff's complaint pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/5/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. Hurst et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy B Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford-Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?