Kelley v. Davis

Plaintiff: James Kelley
Defendant: Jack Davis
Case Number: 5:2009cv00049
Filed: February 19, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 117 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/17/12. (vjt)
February 28, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Scott T. Vaughn to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings in this action; and directing the Clerk to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/28/11. (kpr)
August 26, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 77 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 63 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/26/10. (vjt)
August 2, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 72 Notice (Other) filed by Jack Davis: The Evidentiary Hearing scheduled for August 23, 2010, is continued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/2/10. (bkp)
July 22, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion to Amend/Correct; 57 Motion to Compel 59 Motion to Vacate ; 60 Motion to Take Deposition ; 61 Motion for Trial; 64 Motion for Order; 65 Motion to Disqualify Judge; and granting 67 Motion to Clarify; and ordering deft to respond to pltf's request concerning the existence of internal investigation reports within seven days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/22/10. (bkp)
May 26, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the deft to respond to plaintiff's 11 MOTION to Compel, which the Court is construing as a motion for preliminary injunctive relief, within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/26/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?