Rodriguez v. Buchanna

Plaintiff: Manuel Rodriguez
Defendant: Tina Buchanna
Case Number: 5:2009cv00061
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting re 43 Report and Recommendations; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous. Complaint is DISMISED WITH PREJUDICE. The court hereby certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any in forma pauperis appeal taken from an order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/14/09. (dac)
September 21, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending deft's motion to dismiss, which the Court construes as a motion for summary judgment be granted, and pltf's complaint against the deft be dismissed with prejudice 15 ; further recommending the Court certify that any in forma pauperis appeal taken from and Order and Judgment dismissing this action be considered frivolous and not in good faith; Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 9/21/09. (tjj)
May 26, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tina Buchanna ordering plaintiff to file a response within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/26/09. (bkp)
April 9, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve deft with summons, original and amended complaints without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/9/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Buchanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Buchanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?