Maxwell v. White

Plaintiff: Robert T Maxwell
Defendant: D White
Case Number: 5:2009cv00111
Filed: April 14, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Petitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/30/2012. (srw)
June 5, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 79 MOTION for Order filed by Robert T Maxwell. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send the Attorney General a copy of the motion for relief of judgment. The Attorney General is directed to file a response within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/5/12. (kpr)
December 30, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 45 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/30/09. (dac)
December 14, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of D White against Robert T Maxwell re 41 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/14/09. (bkp)
November 20, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Petitioner's 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DISMISSED with prejudice; that the relief requested be DENIED; that Petitioner's outstanding motions be DISMISSED as moot. Objections to REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS due 11 days from the entry date of these recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/20/2009. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?