Aaron v. Harris

Plaintiff: Billy Charles Aaron
Defendant: Grant Harris
Case Number: 5:2009cv00158
Filed: June 1, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Larry Norris against Billy Charles Aaron re 28 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/10/09. (bkp)
November 17, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Petitioner's 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DISMISSED with prejudice and the requested relief be DENIED. Objections to REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS due 11 days from the entry date of this REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/17/2009. (jas)
July 9, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting petitioner 30 days in which to file a reply to 12 Response to Habeas Petition filed by Larry Norris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/9/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Charles Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?